AL HJR4 | 2015 | Organizational Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:48 p.m. on March 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Acts and journals of 2015 Organizational, Regular, and any Special Sessions, to be bound together

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Acts and journals of 2015 Organizational, Regular, and any Special Sessions, to be bound together

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:48 p.m. on March 18, 2015.
2015-03-18HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-03-18SenateSignature Requested
2015-03-17HouseEnrolled
2015-03-17HousePassed Second House
2015-03-17SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-03-17SenateReported from Rules
2015-03-10SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2015-03-03HouseCollins motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback