AL HJR4 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:55 p.m. on February 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:55 p.m. on February 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama's Casualties in the War on Terror, portion of Interstate 65 in Chilton Co., designated
Title
Alabama's Casualties in the War on Terror, portion of Interstate 65 in Chilton Co., designated
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 1:55 p.m. on February 13, 2014. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-28. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-13 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-02-06 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |