AL HJR389 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife and Sport Fish Restoration Program, 75th Anniversary, recognized
Title
Wildlife and Sport Fish Restoration Program, 75th Anniversary, recognized
Sponsors
Sen. Donnie Chesteen [R] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. Dexter Grimsley [D] |
Rep. Thomas Jackson [D] | Rep. Paul Lee [R] | Sen. Jim McClendon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-596. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-04-17 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-04-17 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-17 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-04-12 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |