AL HJR385 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 7:29 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sesquicentennial of voting and office holding by African American in Alabama, recognized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sesquicentennial of voting and office holding by African American in Alabama, recognized

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:29 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-357.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HousePassed Second House
2017-05-19SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19SenateReported from Rules
2017-05-04SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2017-05-04HouseBoothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-04HouseReported from Rules as
2017-04-27HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback