AL HJR378 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
InfantSEE, Promoting awareness of early detection of eye disorders, recognized
Title
InfantSEE, Promoting awareness of early detection of eye disorders, recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-311. | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-02 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-02 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-04-17 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-04-17 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-17 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-04-12 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |