AL HJR348 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Chambers, Kent, outstanding professional achievement, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chambers, Kent, outstanding professional achievement, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-333.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HousePassed Second House
2016-05-04SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04SenateReported from Rules
2016-04-28SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2016-04-28HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-28HouseReported from Rules
2016-04-26HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback