AL HJR332 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wallace State Community College Softball Team, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wallace State Community College Softball Team, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseForwarded to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-402.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-04HouseEnrolled
2015-06-04HousePassed Second House
2015-06-04SenateDial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-04SenateReceived in Senate
2015-06-03HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-03HouseReported from Rules
2015-06-02HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback