AL HJR331 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 7:22 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 7:22 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Museums, small town museums trail, Tourism Department encouraged to establish
Title
Museums, small town museums trail, Tourism Department encouraged to establish
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Beech [D] | Rep. Johnny Morrow [D] | Rep. Todd Greeson [R] | Rep. Randall Shedd [R] |
Rep. David Standridge [R] | Rep. Kurt Wallace [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 7:22 p.m. on April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-328. |
2014-04-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |