AL HJR303 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Officer James Fezatte Memorial Highway, portion of Alabama Highway 143 between Mile Markers 5 and 6 in Millbrook, named

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Officer James Fezatte Memorial Highway, portion of Alabama Highway 143 between Mile Markers 5 and 6 in Millbrook, named

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-584.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2012-05-16 Reported from Rules
2012-03-22 Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2012-03-22 Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2012-03-22 Reported from Rules
2012-03-20 Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback