AL HJR3 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 1 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:51p.m. on October 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 1 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:51p.m. on October 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sgt. Rodney J. Evans, State Highway 55 South in Covington County, renamed in honor of
Title
Sgt. Rodney J. Evans, State Highway 55 South in Covington County, renamed in honor of
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:51p.m. on October 1, 2021. |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-10-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-10-01 | House | Enrolled |
2021-10-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-09-28 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-09-28 | House | Reported from Rules |
2021-09-27 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |