AL HJR273 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on April 21, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Brown, Joey, nominee for the 2016 Alabama Legislative Medal of Honor for Law Enforcement, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brown, Joey, nominee for the 2016 Alabama Legislative Medal of Honor for Law Enforcement, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on April 21, 2016.
2016-04-21HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-206.
2016-04-21HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-04-21SenateSignature Requested
2016-04-20HouseEnrolled
2016-04-20HousePassed Second House
2016-04-20SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-20SenateReported from Rules
2016-04-19SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2016-04-13HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-13HouseReported from Rules
2016-04-12HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback