AL HJR273 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Delivered to Governor at 2:03 p.m. on April 18, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Blackwell, Tony Wayne, commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blackwell, Tony Wayne, commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:03 p.m. on April 18, 2013.
2013-04-18HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-103.
2013-04-18HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-04-18SenateSignature Requested
2013-04-18HouseEnrolled
2013-04-18HousePassed Second House
2013-04-18SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2013-04-18SenateReported from Rules
2013-04-11SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2013-04-11HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2013-04-11HouseReported from Rules
2013-04-10HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback