AL HJR267 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Forwarded to Governor on March 18, 2014 at 6:03 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Forwarded to Governor on March 18, 2014 at 6:03 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medication Adherence Day, March 18th at Alabama State Capitol, recognized
Title
Medication Adherence Day, March 18th at Alabama State Capitol, recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 18, 2014 at 6:03 p.m. on March 18, 2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-197. |
2014-03-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |