AL HJR242 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Delivered to Governor at 6:05 p.m. on April 19, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Delivered to Governor at 6:05 p.m. on April 19, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taiwan, relations with the United States, commended
Title
Taiwan, relations with the United States, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:05 p.m. on April 19, 2016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-177. |
2016-04-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-04-19 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2016-04-12 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported from Rules |
2016-04-07 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |