AL HJR232 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Rules first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Rules first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sarcoidosis Awareness Month, recognized
Title
Sarcoidosis Awareness Month, recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Rules first Substitute Offered |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-331. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2016-04-07 | House | Engrossed |
2016-04-07 | House | Engrossed |
2016-04-07 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-07 | House | Rules Substitute Offered |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and |
2016-04-05 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |