AL HJR227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:02 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:02 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Miller, Patricia Holliday, death mourned
Title
Miller, Patricia Holliday, death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Carns [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:02 p.m. on May 23, 2019. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-288. |
2019-05-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2019-05-16 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported from Rules |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |