AL HJR225 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Delivered to Governor at 9:11 a.m. on March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Delivered to Governor at 9:11 a.m. on March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Byler Road, recognized
Title
Historic Byler Road, recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:11 a.m. on March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-152. |
2014-03-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |