AL HJR180 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-17)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging University of Alabama System Board of Trustees to pursue Condoleezza Rice as Chancellor of University of Alabama System
Title
Urging University of Alabama System Board of Trustees to pursue Condoleezza Rice as Chancellor of University of Alabama System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - Galliher motion to Adopt (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-03-15 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-02-28 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 142 | |
2012-02-28 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |