AL HJR173 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:03 p. m. on May 8, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:03 p. m. on May 8, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Waterfront Access Study Committee extended to tenth Legislative day of the 2013 Reg. Sess.
Title
Alabama Waterfront Access Study Committee extended to tenth Legislative day of the 2013 Reg. Sess.
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Bridges [R] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Victor Gaston [R] |
Rep. Richard Laird [D] | Rep. Wes Long [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Sen. David Sessions [R] |
Rep. Harry Shiver [R] | Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Forwarded to Governor at 4:03 p. m. on May 8, 2012. | |
2012-05-08 | Assigned Act No. 2012-342. | |
2012-05-08 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-08 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-08 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-03-15 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-02-28 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-28 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |