AL HJR163 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide Trauma System Funding Legislative Committee continued until 2014
Title
Statewide Trauma System Funding Legislative Committee continued until 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-582. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-03-15 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-02-28 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-28 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |