AL HJR162 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 18, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kilgore, Mike, commended
Title
Kilgore, Mike, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Guin [D] | Rep. Tommy Sherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 18, 2010. | |
2010-02-18 | Assigned Act No. 2010-76. | |
2010-02-18 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-02-18 | Signature Requested | |
2010-02-17 | Enrolled | |
2010-02-17 | Passed Second House | |
2010-02-17 | Denton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-17 | Received in Senate | |
2010-01-28 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-28 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |