AL HJR160 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on April 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on April 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Holocaust education, endorsing and encouraging in the state
Title
Holocaust education, endorsing and encouraging in the state
Sponsors
Rep. David Faulkner [R] | Rep. Jim Carns [R] | Rep. Danny Garrett [R] | Rep. Victor Gaston [R] |
Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Chris Pringle [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Jones (M) motion to Table Roll Call 647 (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on April 27, 2021. |
2021-04-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-334. |
2021-04-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2021-04-20 | House | Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-20 | House | Taken up |
2021-04-20 | House | Jones (M) motion to remove from table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-06 | House | Jones (M) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 647 |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported from Rules and tabled |
2021-03-30 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |