AL HJR140 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Terrorism reinsurance, U.S. Congress urged to reauthorize
Title
Terrorism reinsurance, U.S. Congress urged to reauthorize
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor at 1:15 p.m. on March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-149. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-03-04 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |