AL HJR126 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Owens, James Cleveland "Jesse," commended; Jesse Owens Parkway, portion of Highway 36 in Morgan County from the intersection of Highway 36 with Interstate 65 to the Lawrence County line, named
Title
Owens, James Cleveland "Jesse," commended; Jesse Owens Parkway, portion of Highway 36 in Morgan County from the intersection of Highway 36 with Interstate 65 to the Lawrence County line, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Governor at 2:30 p.m. on March 25, 2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-282. | |
2010-03-25 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-03-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-25 | Barron motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-03-25 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-03-11 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2010-01-26 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-26 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |