AL HJR112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:54 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:54 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Boys and Girls Clubs of America, week of April 8-12, 2019, recognized
Title
National Boys and Girls Clubs of America, week of April 8-12, 2019, recognized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:54 p.m. on May 7, 2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-140. |
2019-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2019-04-09 | House | Clarke motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced |