AL HJR112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:32 p.m. on March 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:32 p.m. on March 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama's Bicentennial, supporting celebration
Title
Alabama's Bicentennial, supporting celebration
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 83 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 5:32 p.m. on March 15, 2017. |
2017-03-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-108. |
2017-03-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-03-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | Boothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported from Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |