AL HJR110 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Task Force on 21st Century Firearm Laws, established

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on 21st Century Firearm Laws, established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Farley motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-342.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2017-05-19SenateOrr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1320
2017-05-19SenateHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2017-05-19HouseTreadaway motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1022
2017-05-19HouseExecutive Amendment Offered
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor
2017-05-02HouseEnrolled
2017-05-02SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-02HousePassed Second House
2017-05-02SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-02SenateReported from Rules
2017-03-09SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2017-03-09HouseBoothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-03-09HouseReported from Rules
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback