AL HJR110 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 5:02 p.m. on March 8, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 5:02 p.m. on March 8, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Culverhouse, Sydney, receiving a Prudential Spirit of Community Award, commended
Title
Culverhouse, Sydney, receiving a Prudential Spirit of Community Award, commended
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:02 p.m. on March 8, 2016. |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-83. |
2016-03-08 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2016-03-03 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from Rules |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |