AL HJR102 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 2:16 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Old Federal Road Task Force, established, composition, duties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Old Federal Road Task Force, established, composition, duties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 2:16 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseRules first Substitute Offered
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-353.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HousePassed Second House
2014-04-03SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-03SenateReported from Rules
2014-03-20SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2014-03-20HouseEngrossed
2014-03-20HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-20HouseRules Substitute Offered
2014-03-20HouseReported from Rules with 1 substitute and
2014-01-30HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback