AL HJR10 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-14 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:00 p.m. on September 14, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Lakeshore Island, in Guntersville on U.S. 431, designated

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lakeshore Island, in Guntersville on U.S. 431, designated

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-14HouseForwarded to Governor at 5:00 p.m. on September 14, 2015.
2015-09-14HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-543.
2015-09-14HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-14SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-14HouseEnrolled
2015-09-14HousePassed Second House
2015-09-14SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-14SenateReported from Rules
2015-09-11SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2015-09-11HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-11HouseReported from Rules
2015-09-09HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback