AL HJR10 | 2013 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Delivered to Governor on February 19, 2013 at 2:54 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]


Via, Dennis L., commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Via, Dennis L., commended



2013-02-19HouseDelivered to Governor on February 19, 2013 at 2:54 p.m.
2013-02-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-16 on 02/22/2013.
2013-02-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-02-19SenateSignature Requested
2013-02-19HousePassed Second House
2013-02-19SenateMotion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2013-02-19SenateReported from Rules
2013-02-14SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2013-02-14HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2013-02-14HouseReported from Rules
2013-02-05HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules


Alabama State Sources

Bill Comments