AL HJR10 | 2011 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on March 24,2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]


Garner, Eugene, Jr., death mourned

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Garner, Eugene, Jr., death mourned



2011-03-24 Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on March 24,2011.
2011-03-24 Assigned Act No. 2011-32.
2011-03-24 Clerk of the House Certification
2011-03-24 Signature Requested
2011-03-24 Enrolled
2011-03-24 Passed Second House
2011-03-24 Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2011-03-24 Reported from Rules
2011-03-08 Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2011-03-03 Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2011-03-03 Reported from Rules
2011-03-01 Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules


Alabama State Sources

Bill Comments