AL HB99 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Elmore County; to amend Section 45-26-101, Code of Alabama 1975; to provide for the appointment of the county superintendent of education; and to repeal Act 258 of the 1931 Regular Session (Local Acts 1031, p. 117).
Title
Relating to Elmore County; to amend Section 45-26-101, Code of Alabama 1975; to provide for the appointment of the county superintendent of education; and to repeal Act 258 of the 1931 Regular Session (Local Acts 1031, p. 117).
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 86 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-11 - House - Table UBQKGX-1 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 64 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-04-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 86 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-11 - House - Table UBQKGX-1 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 64 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Enacted |
2023-04-18 | House | Enrolled |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-18 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Local Legislation |
2023-04-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-11 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-11 | House | Table UBQKGX-1 |
2023-04-11 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-06 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Favorably from House Local Legislation |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Local Legislation |
2023-03-07 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |