AL HB99 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Children, Youth and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Children, Youth and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State government, Dept. of Senior Services, membership of advisory board further provided, Sec. 38-3-1 am'd.
Title
State government, Dept. of Senior Services, membership of advisory board further provided, Sec. 38-3-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Children, Youth and Human Services |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 104 |
2020-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy |