AL HB99 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dependent children, guardianship or conservatorship of, visitation action by isolated family members, procedure, Secs. 26-2A-112 to 26-2A-117, inclusive, added; Sec. 26-2A-108 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dependent children, guardianship or conservatorship of, visitation action by isolated family members, procedure, Secs. 26-2A-112 to 26-2A-117, inclusive, added; Sec. 26-2A-108 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-404.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04HousePassed Second House
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 977
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-27SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2016-04-20HouseEngrossed
2016-04-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 642
2016-04-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 641
2016-04-20HouseJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2016-04-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback