AL HB98 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Act No. 2018-55.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Act No. 2018-55.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fort Payne, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, city council may permit
Title
Fort Payne, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, city council may permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 55 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 55 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-55. |
2018-01-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:46 P.M. ON jANUARY 30, 2018. |
2018-01-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:46 P.M. ON jANUARY 30, 2018. |
2018-01-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-01-30 | House | Enrolled |
2018-01-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 173 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-01-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 4 |
2018-01-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |