AL HB98 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:22 a.m. on April 27, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Children, Alabama's commitment to the right to life of unborn children, affirmed, const amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children, Alabama's commitment to the right to life of unborn children, affirmed, const amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - Fridy motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Fridy motion to Table (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Williams motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Members intended to cosponsor (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseDelivered to Secretary of State at 10:22 a.m. on April 27, 2017.
2017-04-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-04-27SenateSignature Requested
2017-04-27SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-04-25HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-188.
2017-04-25HouseEnrolled
2017-04-25HouseFridy motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 624
2017-04-25HouseFridy motion to Table adopted Roll Call 623
2017-04-25HouseKnight motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee offered
2017-04-25HouseFridy motion to Concur In and Adopt offered
2017-04-25HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-04-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 660
2017-04-20SenateSingleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 659
2017-04-20SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 658
2017-04-20SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2017-04-20SenateWilliams motion to Table adopted Roll Call 657
2017-04-20SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2017-04-20SenateWilliams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 656
2017-04-20SenateWilliams Amendment Offered
2017-04-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2017-03-16HouseJohnson (K) and Millican intended to vote "Yea"
2017-03-16HouseMembers intended to cosponsor
2017-03-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 327
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB98&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB98-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB98-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185627-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185644-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185658-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=565447&VOTE=327&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=565450&VOTE=328&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570122&VOTE=656&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570136&VOTE=657&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570138&VOTE=658&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570139&VOTE=659&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570140&VOTE=660&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571152&VOTE=623&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571158&VOTE=624&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback