AL HB98 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms, pistol permits, retired military, lifetime permit provided at no cost, power of sheriff to revoke

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, pistol permits, retired military, lifetime permit provided at no cost, power of sheriff to revoke

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - House - Standridge motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-342.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2016-05-03HouseStandridge motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 835
2016-05-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 942
2016-05-03SenateWilliams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 941
2016-05-03SenateWilliams Amendment Offered
2016-05-03SenateDial motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 940
2016-05-03SenateDial first Substitute Offered
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2016-03-23HouseEngrossed
2016-03-23HouseCosponsors Added
2016-03-23HouseHurst intended to vote "Yea"
2016-03-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 401
2016-03-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 400
2016-03-23HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2016-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-17HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB98
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB98-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542862&VOTE=399&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542863&VOTE=400&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542864&VOTE=401&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542862&VOTE=400&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542863&VOTE=401&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542864&VOTE=402&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551344&VOTE=940&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551390&VOTE=941&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551398&VOTE=942&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551533&VOTE=835&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback