AL HB97 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School safety, to require mental health awareness to be included in the annual training session for employees of each K-12 school, Sec. 16-1-44 am'd.
Title
School safety, to require mental health awareness to be included in the annual training session for employees of each K-12 school, Sec. 16-1-44 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1336 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 1335 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 498 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - HBIR: Morris motion to Adopt Roll Call 497 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 1335 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 498 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - HBIR: Morris motion to Adopt Roll Call 497 (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:42 p.m. on May 4, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-424. |
2021-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1336 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2021-03-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 498 |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |