AL HB97 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance adjusters, licensing by Insurance Dept., applicant employed by state insurance company exempt from examination under certain conditions, Sec. 27-9A-9 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance adjusters, licensing by Insurance Dept., applicant employed by state insurance company exempt from examination under certain conditions, Sec. 27-9A-9 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-341.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-03HouseEnrolled
2016-05-03HousePassed Second House
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 939
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-24SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
2016-02-23HouseEngrossed
2016-02-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 80
2016-02-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 79
2016-02-23HouseInsurance Amendment #3 Offered
2016-02-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 78
2016-02-23HouseInsurance Amendment #2 Offered
2016-02-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 77
2016-02-23HouseInsurance Amendment #1 Offered
2016-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
2016-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB97
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB97-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB97-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=536190&VOTE=77&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=536191&VOTE=78&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=536192&VOTE=79&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=536193&VOTE=80&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551340&VOTE=939&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback