AL HB97 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 8:52 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 8:52 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue Department, taxes and fees, suspension by administrative rule when cost of collection is higher than amount collected, periodic review, Sec. 40-1-49 added
Title
Revenue Department, taxes and fees, suspension by administrative rule when cost of collection is higher than amount collected, periodic review, Sec. 40-1-49 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 8:52 p.m. on April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-331. |
2014-04-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1106 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Allen motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2014-01-16 | House | Engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Cosponsors intended to be added |
2014-01-16 | House | Baughn intended to vote "Yea" |
2014-01-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 24 |
2014-01-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 23 |
2014-01-16 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2014-01-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |