AL HB97 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education, National Guard classified as residents for purposes of in-state tuition, Sec. 16-64-2 am'd.
Title
Higher education, National Guard classified as residents for purposes of in-state tuition, Sec. 16-64-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - Wood motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-505. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-16 | Wood motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1596 | |
2012-05-16 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1489 | |
2012-05-16 | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1488 | |
2012-05-16 | Pittman Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2012-03-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 270 | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |