AL HB96 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Delivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on April 27, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Suicide, Assisted Suicide Ban Act, established, person or health care provider prohibited from deliberately providing aid in dying under certain conditions, civil and criminal penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suicide, Assisted Suicide Ban Act, established, person or health care provider prohibited from deliberately providing aid in dying under certain conditions, civil and criminal penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Members intended to cosponsor (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 76) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on April 27, 2017.
2017-04-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-231.
2017-04-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-04-27SenateSignature Requested
2017-04-27SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-04-25HouseEnrolled
2017-04-25HouseButler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 622
2017-04-25HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-04-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 666
2017-04-20SenateWilliams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 665
2017-04-20SenateWilliams Amendment Offered
2017-04-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2017-03-16HouseCarns and Pringle intended to vote "Yea"
2017-03-16HouseMembers intended to cosponsor
2017-03-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 333
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB96&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB96-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=565525&VOTE=333&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=565528&VOTE=334&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570168&VOTE=665&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=570169&VOTE=666&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571107&VOTE=622&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback