AL HB96 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Searches and seizures, surveillance, electronic tracking devices, law enforcement authorized to use upon issuance of a warrant
Title
Searches and seizures, surveillance, electronic tracking devices, law enforcement authorized to use upon issuance of a warrant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-340. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 928 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | House | Coleman and Shiver intended to vote Yea |
2016-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 147 |
2016-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |