AL HB95 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Forwarded to Governor on April 20, 2017 at 3:33 p.m. on April 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Health care providers authorized to decline to perform services that violate their consciences, exceptions, Health Care Rights of Conscience Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care providers authorized to decline to perform services that violate their consciences, exceptions, Health Care Rights of Conscience Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Members intended to cosponsor (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20HouseForwarded to Governor on April 20, 2017 at 3:33 p.m. on April 20, 2017.
2017-04-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-04-20HouseEnrolled
2017-04-20SenateSignature Requested
2017-04-20HousePassed Second House
2017-04-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 663
2017-04-20SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 662
2017-04-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2017-03-16HousePringle intended to vote "Yea"
2017-03-16HouseMembers intended to cosponsor
2017-03-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 330
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback