AL HB95 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers, death and disability benefits for municipal police officers, state troopers and certain other state law enforcement officers, extended to all law enforcement officers, definition of occupational disease to include cancer, AIDS, and hepatitis, Secs. 36-30-20, 36-30-21, 36-30-22, 36-30-23 am'd.
Title
Law enforcement officers, death and disability benefits for municipal police officers, state troopers and certain other state law enforcement officers, extended to all law enforcement officers, definition of occupational disease to include cancer, AIDS, and hepatitis, Secs. 36-30-20, 36-30-21, 36-30-22, 36-30-23 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-549. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1484 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 508 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |