AL HB94 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Forwarded to Secretary of State on March 5, 2020 at 12:59 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Forwarded to Secretary of State on March 5, 2020 at 12:59 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Talladega Co., churches, deadly physical force, use in self-defense or defense of others, const. amend.
Title
Talladega Co., churches, deadly physical force, use in self-defense or defense of others, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - McClendon motion to Local Application Certification (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Motion to Local Application Resolution (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Motion to Local Application Resolution (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Forwarded to Secretary of State on March 5, 2020 at 12:59 p.m. |
2020-03-05 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-16. |
2020-03-05 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | McClendon motion to Local Application Certification adopted Roll Call 255 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 254 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-02-13 | House | Engrossed |
2020-02-13 | House | Motion to Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 14 |
2020-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 13 |
2020-02-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 12 |
2020-02-13 | House | Johnson Amendment Offered |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |