AL HB94 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Governor on May 4, 2016 at 11:36 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, disabled veteran license plates, exemption or reductions in fees, may be applied by disabled veteran to obtain other plates, Secs. 32-6-130, 40-12-244, 40-12-254 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, disabled veteran license plates, exemption or reductions in fees, may be applied by disabled veteran to obtain other plates, Secs. 32-6-130, 40-12-244, 40-12-254 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 0 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseForwarded to Governor on May 4, 2016 at 11:36 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-339.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HousePassed Second House
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 995
2016-05-04SenateHoltzclaw motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 994
2016-05-04SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 993
2016-05-04SenateHoltzclaw Amendment Offered
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2016-03-23HouseCosponsors Added
2016-03-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 394
2016-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-17HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB94
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB94-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542831&VOTE=394&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=543040&VOTE=395&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552326&VOTE=993&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552374&VOTE=994&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552378&VOTE=995&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback