AL HB94 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement accounts, Uniform Probate Code, Roth Individual Retirement Accounts, included as qualified trust for purposes of limitation on assignment and alienation, Sec. 19-3B-508 am'd.
Title
Retirement accounts, Uniform Probate Code, Roth Individual Retirement Accounts, included as qualified trust for purposes of limitation on assignment and alienation, Sec. 19-3B-508 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012. | |
2012-05-09 | Assigned Act No. 2012-381. | |
2012-05-09 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-09 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1135 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2012-03-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 188 | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |