AL HB92 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil practice, asbestos actions; filing requirements, further provided
Title
Civil practice, asbestos actions; filing requirements, further provided
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Stubbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 659 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 658 7R752V2-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 658 7R752V2-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 659 |
2024-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 658 7R752V2-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Judiciary 1st Substitute Offered 7R752V2-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-20 | House | Judiciary 1st Substitute 7R752V2-1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB104 (Same As) 2024-05-23 - Enacted